NC S1456 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-24 - Ch. Res 2010-16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-24 - Ch. Res 2010-16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honor Duke Basketball Team
Title
Honor Duke Basketball Team
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-24 | Ch. Res 2010-16 | |
2010-06-24 | Ratified | |
2010-06-24 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-24 | Cal Pursuant 32(a) | |
2010-06-24 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-24 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-22 | Placed On Cal For 6/24/2010 | |
2010-06-22 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-06-22 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2010-06-21 | Filed |