NC S1460 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Ch. Res 2010-25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Ch. Res 2010-25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honor James Turner
Title
Honor James Turner
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Ch. Res 2010-25 | |
2010-07-08 | Ratified | |
2010-07-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-07 | Cal Pursuant 32(a) | |
2010-07-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-07-07 | Engrossed | |
2010-07-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-07 | Amend Adopted # 1 | |
2010-07-06 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010 | |
2010-07-06 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-06-29 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2010-06-28 | Filed |