NC S149 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Allow Hyperbaric Oxygen Therapy for TBI/PTSD
Title
Allow Hyperbaric Oxygen Therapy for TBI/PTSD
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Davis [D] | Sen. Jim Perry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H50 (Same As) 2019-07-26 - Ch. SL 2019-175
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S149 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S149v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S149v1.pdf |