NC S154 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Ch. SL 2019-163
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Ch. SL 2019-163
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allow Sports/Horse Race Wagering Tribal Lands
Title
Allow Sports/Horse Race Wagering Tribal Lands
Sponsors
Sen. James Davis [R] | Sen. Jay Chaudhuri [D] | Sen. Charles Edwards [R] | Sen. Ralph Hise [R] |
Sen. Paul Lowe [D] | Sen. Jim Perry [R] | Sen. Jerry Tillman [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 90 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | Ch. SL 2019-163 | |
2019-07-26 | Signed by Gov. 7/26/2019 | |
2019-07-18 | Pres. To Gov. 7/17/2019 | |
2019-07-16 | Ratified | |
2019-07-15 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-07-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-07-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-07-10 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/11/2019 |
2019-07-10 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-07-10 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-07-09 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-07-09 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-25 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Commerce, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-25 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-11 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/09/2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H302 (Same As) 2019-03-11 - Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House