NC S155 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Assess Costs of Local LEO Crime Lab Analysis

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assess Costs of Local LEO Crime Lab Analysis

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-18HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-18HouseSerial Referral To Finance Stricken
2019-03-12HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-12HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-11HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-03-11SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-03-07SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-07SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-06SenateReptd Fav
2019-03-05SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-05SenateReptd Fav
2019-02-28SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-28SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-02-28SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-28SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-27SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback