NC S162 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-13)
Status: Passed on February 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-16 - Ch. Res 2009-1
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-13)
Status: Passed on February 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-16 - Ch. Res 2009-1
Summary
NAACP's 100th Anniversary.
Title
NAACP's 100th Anniversary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-16 | Ch. Res 2009-1 | |
2009-02-16 | Ratified | |
2009-02-12 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-02-12 | Placed On Cal For 2/12/2009 | |
2009-02-12 | Cal Pursuant 32(a) | |
2009-02-12 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-12 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-02-12 | Placed On Cal For 2/12/2009 | |
2009-02-11 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S162 |