NC S18 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-102
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-102
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Cemetery Act
Title
Amend Cemetery Act
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Goss [D] | Sen. Jim Jacumin [R] | Sen. John Snow [D] | Sen. Richard Stevens [R] |
Sen. Albin Swindell [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-07-07 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-20 | Ch. SL 2010-102 | |
2010-07-20 | Signed By Gov. 7/20/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Pres. To Gov. 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Ratified | |
2010-07-07 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2010-07-06 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010 | |
2010-07-06 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2010-07-06 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-06 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-17 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II | |
2010-06-17 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-18 | Ref to the Com on Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity, if favorable, Judiciary II | |
2009-05-18 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-12 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-05-12 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-02 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2009-01-29 | Filed |