NC S190 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Ch. SL 2019-190
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Expand Special Assessments for Dam Repair

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expand Special Assessments for Dam Repair

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-23 - House - Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-07-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-01 Ch. SL 2019-190
2019-08-01 Signed by Gov. 8/1/2019
2019-07-25 Pres. To Gov. 7/25/2019
2019-07-24 Ratified
2019-07-23HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-23HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-22HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-17HousePlaced On Cal For 07/22/2019
2019-07-16HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-07-16HouseReptd Fav
2019-07-11HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-11HouseReptd Fav
2019-07-10HouseRe-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-10HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-06-26HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-26HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-06-26HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2019-06-26SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-06-26SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-25SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-24SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/25/2019
2019-06-24SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-20SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/24/2019
2019-06-20SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-18SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-18SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-18SenateRe-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-18SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H281 (Same As) 2019-05-22 - Re-ref Com On Finance

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback