NC S191 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Ch. SL 2019-109
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Out-of-State Law Enforcement/2020 Rep Convtn

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Out-of-State Law Enforcement/2020 Rep Convtn

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - A1 McNeill Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 81 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11 Ch. SL 2019-109
2019-07-11 Signed by Gov. 7/11/2019
2019-07-01 Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2019
2019-06-28 Ratified
2019-06-27SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-27SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2019-06-26SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-06-26HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-06-26HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-06-26HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-26HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-26HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-06-25HousePlaced On Cal For 06/26/2019
2019-06-25HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-06-25HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-06-25HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-25HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-20HousePlaced On Cal For 06/25/2019
2019-06-20HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-17HousePlaced On Cal For 06/20/2019
2019-06-17HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-06-17HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-12HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-12HouseReptd Fav
2019-05-30HouseRe-ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-30HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-02HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-02HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-01HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-04-01SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-03-28SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-28SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-27SenateReptd Fav
2019-03-26SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-26SenateReptd Fav
2019-03-14SenateRe-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-14SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-05SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S191
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S191v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S191v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S191v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S191v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S191v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S191v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S191v6.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/67
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/554
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/553
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/386

Bill Comments

feedback