NC S2 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-04 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-04 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Chamberlin's Law
Title
Chamberlin's Law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2011-04-04 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-01-27 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2011-01-27 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-01-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H426 (Same As) 2011-03-23 - Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B