NC S2 | 2018 | 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-13)
Status: Passed on October 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-03 - Ch. SL 2018-135
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-13)
Status: Passed on October 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-03 - Ch. SL 2018-135
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School Calendar & Pay/Hurricane Florence
Title
School Calendar & Pay/Hurricane Florence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-03 | Ch. SL 2018-135 | |
2018-10-03 | Signed by Gov. 10/3/2018 | |
2018-10-02 | Pres. To Gov. 10/2/2018 | |
2018-10-02 | Ratified | |
2018-10-02 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-10-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-10-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-10-02 | House | Added to Calendar |
2018-10-02 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-10-02 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Filed |