NC S20 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-07 - Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-07 - Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Public Financing Changes
Title
Public Financing Changes
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Atwater [D] | Sen. Douglas Berger [D] | Sen. Eleanor Kinnaird [D] | Sen. Floyd McKissick [D] |
Sen. Martin Nesbitt [D] | Rep. Joe Queen [D] | Sen. John Snow [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-08-06 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-08-05 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-08-05 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 0 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-07-07 - Senate - Motion 10\APPEAL (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-08-05 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-08-05 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 0 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-07-07 - Senate - Motion 10\APPEAL (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-07 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-07 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-06-30 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2010-06-30 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-08-06 | Ref to the Com on Election Law and Campaign Finance Reform, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-08-06 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-08-06 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-05 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-08-05 | Amend Adopted #1 | |
2009-08-04 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-08-04 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-07-29 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-07-29 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-07-07 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2009-07-07 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-07-07 | Amend #2 Not Germane | |
2009-07-07 | Amend Failed #1 | |
2009-07-02 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2009 | |
2009-07-02 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-02-02 | Ref To Com On Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2009-01-29 | Filed |