NC S201 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Town of Bolton/Deannexation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Town of Bolton/Deannexation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-26HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-06-26HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2019-06-26SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-06-26SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-25SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-24SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/25/2019
2019-06-24SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-20SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/24/2019
2019-06-20SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-18SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-18SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-30SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-04-30SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-04-30SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-14SenateRe-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-14SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-07SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-07SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-06SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback