NC S214 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Ch. SL 2019-4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Ensure Orderly 2019 Elections

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensure Orderly 2019 Elections

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - A1 Russell Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 65 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Amendment 1 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Amendment 2 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Amendment 3 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14 Ch. SL 2019-4
2019-03-14 Signed by Gov. 3/14/2019
2019-03-13 Pres. To Gov. 3/13/2019
2019-03-13 Ratified
2019-03-13HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-03-13HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-13HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-13HouseAmend Failed A1
2019-03-12HousePlaced On Cal For 03/13/2019
2019-03-12HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-12HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-12HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-12HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-12HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2019-03-12SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-03-12SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-12SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-12SenateAmend Tabled A3
2019-03-12SenateAmend Tabled A2
2019-03-12SenateAmend Tabled A1
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2019-03-12SenateReptd Fav
2019-03-12SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-12SenateReptd Fav
2019-03-11SenateRef to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-11SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-11SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S214
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S214v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S214v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S214v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S214v3.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/39
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/38
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/37
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/36
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/54
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/53

Bill Comments

feedback