NC S216 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Ch. Res 2019-3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Honor Walter B. Jones, Jr., Former Member

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honor Walter B. Jones, Jr., Former Member

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Third Reading (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13SenateCh. Res 2019-3
2019-03-13 Ratified
2019-03-12HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-03-12HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-12HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-12HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-03-12HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-12HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2019-03-12SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-03-12SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-12SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-11SenatePlaced On Cal For 03/12/2019
2019-03-11SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-11SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback