NC S219 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Ch. SL 2019-71
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Modify Teacher Licensing Requirements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modify Teacher Licensing Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-24 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Ch. SL 2019-71
2019-07-01 Signed by Gov. 7/1/2019
2019-06-26 Pres. To Gov. 6/26/2019
2019-06-25 Ratified
2019-06-24SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-24SenateConf Report Adopted
2019-06-20HouseConf Report Adopted
2019-06-20HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-06-20HouseConf Com Reported
2019-06-20SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/24/2019
2019-06-20SenateConf Com Reported
2019-06-13HouseConf Com Appointed
2019-06-13SenateConf Com Appointed
2019-06-13SenateFailed Concur In H Com Sub
2019-06-12SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-06-12HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-06-12HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-12HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-10HousePlaced On Cal For 06/12/2019
2019-06-10HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-06-10HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-06-05HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-05HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-05-30HouseRe-ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-30HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-06HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-06HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-06HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2019-05-06SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-05-06SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-06SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-02SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-01SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-01SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-05-01SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-04SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-04SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-12SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-12SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-11SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S219
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S219v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S219v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S219v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S219v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S219v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S219v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S219v6.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/168
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/487
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/301
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/516
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/337

Bill Comments

feedback