NC S225 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Ch. SL 2019-68
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repeal Tuition Surcharge

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal Tuition Surcharge

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Ch. SL 2019-68
2019-07-01 Signed by Gov. 7/1/2019
2019-06-26 Pres. To Gov. 6/26/2019
2019-06-25 Ratified
2019-06-24HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-24HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-24HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-19HousePlaced On Cal For 06/24/2019
2019-06-19HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-06-19HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-18HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-18HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-06HouseRe-ref to the Com on Education - Universities, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-06HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-02HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-02HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-01HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-04-01SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-03-28SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-28SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-27SenateReptd Fav
2019-03-21SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-21SenateReptd Fav
2019-03-20SenateRe-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
2019-03-20SenateReptd Fav
2019-03-14SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-14SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-13SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-13SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-12SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback