NC S230 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Ch. SL 2019-201
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

NC Military and Veteran Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NC Military and Veteran Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-13 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-08-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23 Ch. SL 2019-201
2019-08-23 Signed by Gov. 8/23/2019
2019-08-15 Pres. To Gov. 8/15/2019
2019-08-14 Ratified
2019-08-13SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-08-13SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2019-08-07SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-08-07HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-08-06HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-08-06HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-08-05HousePlaced On Cal For 08/06/2019
2019-08-05HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-08-05HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-25HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-25HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-17HouseRe-ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-17HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-03HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-03HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-02HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-04-02SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-04-01SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-01SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-28SenateReptd Fav
2019-03-27SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-27SenateReptd Fav
2019-03-20SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-20SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-20SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-03-20SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-14SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-14SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-13SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-13SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-12SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback