NC S251 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Modernization of Drug Court Program
Title
Modernization of Drug Court Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Filed |