NC S252 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Ch. SL 2019-26
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Ch. SL 2019-26
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Dental Bill of Rights
Title
Dental Bill of Rights
Sponsors
Sen. James Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Ch. SL 2019-26 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by Gov. 6/14/2019 | |
2019-06-07 | Pres. To Gov. 6/7/2019 | |
2019-06-06 | Ratified | |
2019-06-05 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-06-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-06-05 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-06-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/05/2019 |
2019-06-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-06-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-20 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-20 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-09 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-08 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Commerce and Insurance |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H704 (Same As) 2019-08-27 - Ref To Com On Finance