NC S262 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Ch. SL 2019-62
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Ch. SL 2019-62
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Union/Prohibit Certain Hunting Acts
Title
Union/Prohibit Certain Hunting Acts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Ch. SL 2019-62 | |
2019-06-27 | Ratified | |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Concurred In H Com Sub |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2019-06-25 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2019-06-25 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-06-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/25/2019 |
2019-06-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-06-24 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-18 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-18 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-05-21 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Wildlife Resources, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-21 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-09 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-08 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Filed |