NC S280 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Ch. SL 2013-297
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Ch. SL 2013-297
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DCR/Historic Sites/Fees
Title
DCR/Historic Sites/Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-02 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-18 | Ch. SL 2013-297 | |
2013-07-18 | Signed by Gov. 7/18/2013 | |
2013-07-10 | Pres. To Gov. 07/10/2013 | |
2013-07-09 | Ratified | |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/02/2013 |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Rec To Concur H Com Sub |
2013-06-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/27/2013 |
2013-06-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-06-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-06-07 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-06-07 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-04-02 | House | Ref To Com On Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs |
2013-04-02 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-01 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Ref To Com On Transportation |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H322 (Same As) 2013-06-26 - Ch. SL 2013-201