NC S295 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-13 - Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education
Pending: Senate Education/Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Standards of Student Conduct

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Standards of Student Conduct

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-07 - House - Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-08-07 - House - A4 Horn Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-08-06 - House - A1 Torbett Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-08-06 - House - A2 Elmore Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-08-06 - House - A3 Reives Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-08-06 - House - M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 64 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-08-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 62 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-13SenateRe-ref Com On Education/Higher Education
2019-08-13SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-08-09SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-08-08HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-08-07HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-08-07HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-08-07HouseAmend Adopted A4
2019-08-06HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-08-06HouseAmend Adopted A3
2019-08-06HouseAmend Adopted A2
2019-08-06HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-08-05HousePlaced On Cal For 08/06/2019
2019-08-05HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-08-05HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-07-30HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-30HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-07-29HouseRe-ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-29HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-20HouseRe-ref to the Com on Education - Universities, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-20HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-01HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-01HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-30HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-04-30SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-04-29SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-29SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-18SenatePlaced On Cal For 04/29/2019
2019-04-18SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-17SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-17SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-10SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-10SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-20SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-20SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-19SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S295
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S295v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S295v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S295v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S295v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S295v4.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/121
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/733
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/732
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/731
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/730
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/729
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/738
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/739

Bill Comments

feedback