NC S297 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Ch. SL 2019-145
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Cancer Research Advisory Panel

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cancer Research Advisory Panel

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-09 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-19 Ch. SL 2019-145
2019-07-19 Signed by Gov. 7/19/2019
2019-07-11 Pres. To Gov. 7/11/2019
2019-07-10 Ratified
2019-07-09HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-09HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-09HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-08HousePlaced On Cal For 07/09/2019
2019-07-08HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-07-08HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-27HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-27HouseReptd Fav
2019-05-30HouseRe-ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-30HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-04HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-04HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-03HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-04-03SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-04-02SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-02SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-28SenatePlaced On Cal For 04/02/2019
2019-03-28SenateReptd Fav
2019-03-27SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-27SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-03-27SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-21SenateRe-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-21SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-20SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-20SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-19SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback