NC S3 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-13 - Ch. SL 2014-118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-13 - Ch. SL 2014-118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
JMAC Modifications
Title
JMAC Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - House - Motion 12 - Remove Unfav. Cal. (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - House - M8 Re-Refer Rules, Cal., & Oper. House Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - House - M6 Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - House - M12 Suspend Rules (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - House - Motion 12 - Recall from HPC Off. (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - House - Motion 12 - Remove Unfav. Cal. (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - House - M8 Re-Refer Rules, Cal., & Oper. House Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - House - M6 Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - House - M12 Suspend Rules (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - House - Motion 12 - Recall from HPC Off. (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-13 | Ch. SL 2014-118 | |
2014-09-13 | Signed by Gov. 9/13/2014 | |
2014-08-20 | Pres. To Gov. 08/20/2014 | |
2014-08-20 | Ratified | |
2014-08-20 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-08-20 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-08-20 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-08-20 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-08-20 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-08-20 | House | Reptd Fav |
2014-08-20 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2014-08-20 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-08-20 | House | Removed From Unfav Cal |
2014-08-20 | House | Reptd Unfav |
2014-08-20 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2014-08-20 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-08-20 | House | Reconsidered 3rd Reading |
2014-08-20 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-07-01 | House | Senate refused |
2014-07-01 | House | Return To Senate Message Sent To Senate |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Message Sent To House |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Ordered Return to House |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2014-06-26 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2014-06-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-26 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-06-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-06-26 | House | Reptd Fav |
2014-06-25 | House | Re-ref Com On State Personnel |
2014-06-25 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-06-11 | House | Ref To Com On Appropriations |
2014-06-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-06-10 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Ref To Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Filed |