NC S3 | 2018 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-04 - Ch. SL 2018-130
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Party Disclosure/2018 Judicial Races

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Party Disclosure/2018 Judicial Races

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-04 - Senate - Motion 11 Veto Override (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-08-04 - House - Veto Override (Y: 70 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-07-24 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-07-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-07-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 8 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-04 Ch. SL 2018-130
2018-08-04HouseVeto Overridden
2018-08-04HouseAdded to Calendar
2018-08-04HouseVeto Received from the Senate
2018-08-04SenateVeto Overridden
2018-08-02SenatePlaced On Cal For 08/04/2018
2018-08-02SenateWithdrawn From Com
2018-07-30SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-07-27 Vetoed 07/27/2018
2018-07-24 Pres. To Gov. 7/24/2018
2018-07-24 Ratified
2018-07-24HouseOrdered Enrolled
2018-07-24HousePassed 3rd Reading
2018-07-24HousePassed 2nd Reading
2018-07-24HouseAdded to Calendar
2018-07-24HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2018-07-24HouseReptd Fav
2018-07-24HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2018-07-24HousePassed 1st Reading
2018-07-24HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2018-07-24SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2018-07-24SenateEngrossed
2018-07-24SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2018-07-24SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2018-07-24SenateAmend Adopted A2
2018-07-24SenateAmendment Withdrawn A1
2018-07-24SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2018-07-24SenateReptd Fav
2018-07-24SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-07-24SenateReptd Fav
2018-07-24SenateRef to Select Committee on Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-07-24SenatePassed 1st Reading
2018-07-24SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2017E1&BillID=S3&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017E1/Bills/Senate/HTML/S3v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017E1/Bills/Senate/HTML/S3v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017E1/Bills/Senate/HTML/S3v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017E1/Bills/Senate/HTML/S3v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017E1/Bills/Senate/HTML/S3v4.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017E1&sChamber=H&RCS=4
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017E1&sChamber=S&RCS=4
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017E1&sChamber=S&RCS=3
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017E1&sChamber=H&RCS=7
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017E1&sChamber=S&RCS=5

Bill Comments

feedback