NC S301 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Ch. SL 2019-184
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Regional School Modifications

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regional School Modifications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-22 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-07-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 99 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-07-15 - House - A1 Smith, K. Second Reading (Y: 54 N: 63 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 22 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-01 Ch. SL 2019-184
2019-08-01 Signed by Gov. 8/1/2019
2019-07-24 Pres. To Gov. 7/24/2019
2019-07-23 Ratified
2019-07-22SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-22SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2019-07-16SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/22/2019
2019-07-16SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-07-16HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-07-15HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-15HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-15HouseAmend Failed A1
2019-07-11HousePlaced On Cal For 07/15/2019
2019-07-11HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-07-11HouseReptd Fav
2019-07-10HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-10HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-07-04HouseRe-ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-04HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-11HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-11HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-10HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-04-10SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-04-09SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-09SenateAmend Failed A2
2019-04-08SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-08SenateAmendment Withdrawn A1
2019-04-04SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-03SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-03SenateReptd Fav
2019-03-20SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-20SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-20SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-19SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S301
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S301v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S301v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S301v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S301v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S301v4.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/78
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/84
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/83
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/665
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/666
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/509

Bill Comments

feedback