NC S305 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Commerce and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Commerce and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
OLB Reform
Title
OLB Reform
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H910 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - Ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S305 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S305v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S305v1.pdf |