NC S311 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Ch. SL 2019-114
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Massage Board Membership

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Massage Board Membership

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11 Ch. SL 2019-114
2019-07-11 Signed by Gov. 7/11/2019
2019-07-01 Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2019
2019-06-28 Ratified
2019-06-27SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-27SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2019-06-26SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-06-25HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-06-25HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-25HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-24HousePlaced On Cal For 06/25/2019
2019-06-24HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-06-24HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-05-09HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-09HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-08HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-05-08SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-05-07SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-07SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-06SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-02SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-02SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-05-02SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-25SenateRe-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-25SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-20SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-20SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-19SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H607 (Same As) 2019-06-26 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback