NC S315 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-17 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-17 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Summary
Southport Annexation Agreement.
Title
Southport Annexation Agreement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-17 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2009-06-17 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-06-08 | Postponed To 6/18/2009 | |
2009-06-01 | Postponed To 6/8/2009 | |
2009-05-28 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-05-27 | Placed On Cal For 5/28/2009 | |
2009-05-27 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-27 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-20 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-05-20 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-25 | Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-03-25 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-23 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-03-19 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-03-18 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-03-18 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-26 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2009-02-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H347 (Same As) 2011-03-15 - Ref to the Com on Health and Human Services, if favorable, Judiciary Subcommittee A
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S315 |