NC S321 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Ch. SL 2019-196
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Ch. SL 2019-196
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Motor Carrier Safety/PRISM
Title
Federal Motor Carrier Safety/PRISM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-06 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-07-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-14 | Ch. SL 2019-196 | |
2019-08-14 | Signed by Gov. 8/14/2019 | |
2019-08-08 | Pres. To Gov. 8/8/2019 | |
2019-08-07 | Ratified | |
2019-08-06 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-08-06 | Senate | Concurred In H Com Sub |
2019-07-24 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2019-07-24 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-07-23 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-07-23 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-07-22 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/23/2019 |
2019-07-22 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-07-22 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-05-07 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-06 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H257 (Same As) 2019-07-11 - Ch. SL 2019-115