NC S343 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Ch. SL 2019-165
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Ch. SL 2019-165
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Various Education Law Changes
Title
Various Education Law Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-15 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - House - A1 Hurley Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - House - A1 Hurley Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | Ch. SL 2019-165 | |
2019-07-26 | Signed by Gov. 7/26/2019 | |
2019-07-18 | Pres. To Gov. 7/17/2019 | |
2019-07-16 | Ratified | |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Concurred In H Com Sub |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2019-07-10 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-07-09 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2019-07-09 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-07-09 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-07-09 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-07-08 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/09/2019 |
2019-07-08 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-07-08 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2019-06-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-25 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-06-21 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-21 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-10 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-09 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Filed |