NC S353 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-04 - Ch. SL 2019-215
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Amend Cartway Path/Septic Tank Laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amend Cartway Path/Septic Tank Laws

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-26 - Senate - For Concurrence Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Senate - For Concurrence Second Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - House - Third Reading (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-08-13 - House - A2 Brody Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-08-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-08-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-08-08 - House - A1 Saine Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-08-08 - House - M6 Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-04 Ch. SL 2019-215
2019-09-04 Signed by Gov. 9/4/2019
2019-08-28 Pres. To Gov. 8/28/2019
2019-08-27 Ratified
2019-08-26SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-08-26SenateConcurred On 3rd Reading
2019-08-21SenateConcurred On 2nd Reading
2019-08-20SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-08-20HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-08-19HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-08-19HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-08-13HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-08-13HouseAmend Adopted A2
2019-08-08HousePlaced On Cal For 08/12/2019
2019-08-08HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-08-08HousePlaced On Cal For 08/09/2019
2019-08-08HouseA1 Ruled Material
2019-08-08HouseReconsidered 3rd Reading
2019-08-08HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-08-08HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-08-08HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-08-08HouseReconsidered 3rd Reading
2019-08-08HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-08-08HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-08-07HousePlaced On Cal For 08/08/2019
2019-08-07HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-08-07HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-25HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-25HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-17HouseRe-ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-17HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-01HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-01HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-30HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-04-30SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-04-29SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-29SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-18SenatePlaced On Cal For 04/29/2019
2019-04-18SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-17SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-17SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-04-17SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-10SenateRe-ref Com On Judiciary
2019-04-10SenateReptd Fav
2019-03-27SenateRe-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-27SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-26SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-26SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-25SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S353
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S353v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S353v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S353v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S353v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S353v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S353v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S353v6.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/122
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/752
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/747
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/748
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/746
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/755
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/756
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/760
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/555
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/556

Bill Comments

feedback