NC S354 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Ch. SL 2010-128
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Ch. SL 2010-128
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Continuing Care Retire. Community/Home Care
Title
Continuing Care Retire. Community/Home Care
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Atwater [D] | Sen. Douglas Berger [D] | Sen. Tony Foriest [D] | Sen. Eleanor Kinnaird [D] |
Sen. Floyd McKissick [D] | Sen. Martin Nesbitt [D] | Sen. Richard Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-07-07 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-21 | Ch. SL 2010-128 | |
2010-07-21 | Signed By Gov. 7/21/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Pres. To Gov. 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Ratified | |
2010-07-07 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2010-07-07 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010 | |
2010-07-07 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2010-07-07 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-07-07 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2010-07-06 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010 | |
2010-07-06 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2010-07-06 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-06 | Cal For Immediate Consid | |
2010-07-06 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-07-06 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2010-07-06 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2010-07-01 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2010-06-30 | Placed On Cal For 7/1/2010 | |
2010-06-30 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-30 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-29 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-06-29 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 3 | |
2010-06-16 | Re-ref Com On Insurance | |
2010-06-16 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2010-06-02 | Re-ref to the Com on Aging, if favorable, Insurance, if favorable, Finance | |
2010-06-02 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-05-26 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2009-05-26 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-30 | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-04-30 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-28 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-23 | Placed On Cal For 4/28/2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-04-23 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-18 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2009-03-18 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-02 | Ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2009-02-26 | Filed |