NC S361 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - Failed Concur In H Com Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Healthy NC

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Healthy NC

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-20 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-08-12 - House - Motion 12 Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 57 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-08-12 - House - Third Reading (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-08-08 - House - A1 Dobson Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-08-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-20SenateFailed Concur In H Com Sub
2019-08-14SenatePlaced On Cal For 08/20/2019
2019-08-14SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-08-13HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-08-12HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-08-12HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-08-08HousePlaced On Cal For 08/12/2019
2019-08-08HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-08-08HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-08-08HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-08-07HousePlaced On Cal For 08/08/2019
2019-08-07HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-08-07HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-08-06HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-08-06HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-28HouseRe-ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-28HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-06-26HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-26HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-06-26HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2019-06-26SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-06-26SenateEngrossed
2019-06-26SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-26SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-26SenateAmend Adopted A2
2019-06-26SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-06-25SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/26/2019
2019-06-25SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-24SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/25/2019
2019-06-24SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-20SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/24/2019
2019-06-20SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-13SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-13SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-12SenateRe-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-12SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-06-12SenateRe-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
2019-06-12SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-12SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-08SenateRe-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-27SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-27SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-26SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S361
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S361v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S361v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S361v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S361v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S361v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S361v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S361v6.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/354
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/353
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/352
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/751
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/750
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/754
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/753
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/553

Bill Comments

feedback