NC S366 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Ch. SL 2019-185
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

9th/10th Grade/College Transfer Pathways

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

9th/10th Grade/College Transfer Pathways

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-22 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-07-17 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 1 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-01 Ch. SL 2019-185
2019-08-01 Signed by Gov. 8/1/2019
2019-07-24 Pres. To Gov. 7/24/2019
2019-07-23 Ratified
2019-07-22SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-22SenateConf Report Adopted
2019-07-17HouseConf Report Adopted
2019-07-16HousePlaced On Cal For 07/17/2019
2019-07-16HouseCal Pursuant Rule 44(d)
2019-07-16HouseConf Com Reported
2019-07-16SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/22/2019
2019-07-16SenateConf Com Reported
2019-06-26HouseConf Com Appointed
2019-06-26SenateConf Com Appointed
2019-06-25SenateFailed Concur In H Com Sub
2019-06-24SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-06-21HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-06-20HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-20HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-17HousePlaced On Cal For 06/20/2019
2019-06-17HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-06-17HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-12HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-12HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-05-20HouseRe-ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-20HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-09HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-09HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-07HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-05-07SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-05-06SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-06SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-02SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-01SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-01SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-05-01SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-27SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-27SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-27SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-27SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-26SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S366
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S366v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S366v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S366v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S366v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S366v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S366v5.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/174
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/512
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/349
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/681
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/513

Bill Comments

feedback