NC S377 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Military Base Protection Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military Base Protection Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-25HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-24HouseRe-ref to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-24HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-06-12HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-12HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-06-12HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2019-06-12SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-06-12SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-12SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-10SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/12/2019
2019-06-10SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-05SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-05SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-05SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-04SenateRe-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-04SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-02SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-02SenateReptd Fav
2019-03-28SenateRe-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-28SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-28SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-28SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-27SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback