NC S395 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Grace for CCRC/Waive Time Limit for ABAWD
Title
Grace for CCRC/Waive Time Limit for ABAWD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-22 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2020-06-22 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/23/2020 |
2020-06-22 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2020-06-22 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2020-06-18 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2020-06-18 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-01 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-30 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/29/2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Filed |