NC S399 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Ch. SL 2019-110
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Rehire High-Need Teachers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rehire High-Need Teachers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11 Ch. SL 2019-110
2019-07-11 Signed by Gov. 7/11/2019
2019-07-01 Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2019
2019-06-28 Ratified
2019-06-27SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-27SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2019-06-26SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-06-25HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-06-25HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-25HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-24HousePlaced On Cal For 06/25/2019
2019-06-24HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-06-24HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-18HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-18HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-17HouseRe-ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-17HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-06-12HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-12HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-10HouseRe-ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-10HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-09HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-09HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-08HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2019-05-08SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-05-08SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-08SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-07SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-06SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-06SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-05-06SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-17SenateRe-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement and Aging
2019-04-17SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-04-17SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-03SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-03SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-01SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-01SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-28SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback