NC S408 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-16 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-16 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
COLA for TSERS & CJRS
Title
COLA for TSERS & CJRS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2020-06-16 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2020-06-16 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added |
2020-06-16 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations Added |
2020-06-16 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2020-06-11 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-11 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-09 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-07 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Filed |