NC S409 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-10 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-10 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Study NC Veterans Registry
Title
Study NC Veterans Registry
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Davis [D] | Sen. Norman Sanderson [R] | Sen. Jim Burgin [R] | Sen. Kirk deViere [D] |
Sen. Robert Steinburg [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-07-10 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-06 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-06 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-22 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-18 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/17/2019 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/16/2019 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Filed |