NC S412 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Education/Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Education/Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Modify School Qual./Student Success Indicator
Title
Modify School Qual./Student Success Indicator
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H411 (Same As) 2019-07-19 - Ch. SL 2019-142
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S412 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S412v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S412v1.pdf |