NC S413 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Ch. SL 2019-186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Raise the Age Modifications

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Raise the Age Modifications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-22 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-07-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-01 Ch. SL 2019-186
2019-08-01 Signed by Gov. 8/1/2019
2019-07-24 Pres. To Gov. 7/24/2019
2019-07-23 Ratified
2019-07-22SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-22SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2019-07-18SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/22/2019
2019-07-18SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-07-17HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-07-16HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-16HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-15HousePlaced On Cal For 07/16/2019
2019-07-15HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-07-15HouseReptd Fav
2019-07-10HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-10HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-24HouseRe-ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-24HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-07HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-07HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-06HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-05-06SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-05-02SenateEngrossed
2019-05-02SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-02SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-02SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-05-01SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-16SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-16SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-03SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-03SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-01SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-01SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-28SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S413
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S413v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S413v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S413v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S413v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S413v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S413v5.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/151
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/150
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/676
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/511

Bill Comments

feedback