NC S419 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Conf Com Appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Conf Com Appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Technical and Other Changes
Title
Technical and Other Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-10-31 - House - A1 Boles Third Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-10-31 - House - A2 Hall, K. Third Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-10-31 - House - A3 Jackson Third Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-10-31 - House - A4 Lambeth Third Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-10-31 - House - Third Reading (Y: 105 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 74 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-10-31 - House - A1 Boles Third Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-10-31 - House - A2 Hall, K. Third Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-10-31 - House - A3 Jackson Third Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-10-31 - House - A4 Lambeth Third Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-10-31 - House - Third Reading (Y: 105 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 74 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/01/2020 |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2019-10-31 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2019-10-31 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2019-10-31 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-10-31 | House | Amend Adopted A4 |
2019-10-31 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2019-10-31 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2019-10-31 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-10-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-10-30 | House | Added to Calendar |
2019-10-30 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-10-30 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-05-09 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-08 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Filed |