NC S429 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Ch. SL 2019-224
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Disaster Recovery - 2019 Budget Provisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disaster Recovery - 2019 Budget Provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-12 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-18 Ch. SL 2019-224
2019-09-18 Signed by Gov. 9/18/2019
2019-09-16 Pres. To Gov. 9/16/2019
2019-09-13 Ratified
2019-09-12SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-09-12SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2019-09-11SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-09-11HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-09-11HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-09-11HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-09-10HousePlaced On Cal For 09/11/2019
2019-09-10HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-09-10HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2019-09-10HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-09-05HouseRe-ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-09-05HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-06-21HouseRe-ref to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-21HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-06-18HouseRe-ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-18HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-06-17HouseRe-ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-17HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-01HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-01HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-30HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-04-30SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-04-29SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-29SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-18SenatePlaced On Cal For 04/29/2019
2019-04-18SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-17SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-17SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-09SenateRe-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-09SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-03SenateRe-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-03SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-01SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-01SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H529 (Same As) 2019-07-08 - Ch. SL 2019-88

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback