NC S430 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Ch. SL 2010-73
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Ch. SL 2010-73
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Wilmington Civil Service/Amendments
Title
Wilmington Civil Service/Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-08 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Ch. SL 2010-73 | |
2010-07-08 | Ratified | |
2010-07-08 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2010-07-07 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-07 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2010-07-07 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-07 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-06 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-30 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2010-06-30 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-18 | Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-05-18 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-12 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-05-12 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-05 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2009-03-04 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H729 (Same As) 2009-03-23 - Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Judiciary I