NC S438 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Vetoed on August 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Excellent Public Schools Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Excellent Public Schools Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-08 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 68 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-08-07 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-07-24 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 19 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-07-22 - House - A3 Richardson Third Reading (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-07-22 - House - A4 Meyer Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-07-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-07-17 - House - A1 Pittman Second Reading (Y: 23 N: 86 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-07-17 - House - A2 Pittman Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-07-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 59 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-26SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-08-22 Vetoed 08/23/2019
2019-08-14 Pres. To Gov. 8/14/2019
2019-08-13 Ratified
2019-08-09SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-08-08HouseConf Report Adopted
2019-08-07HousePlaced On Cal For 08/08/2019
2019-08-07HouseCal Pursuant Rule 44(d)
2019-08-07HouseConf Com Reported
2019-08-07SenateConf Report Adopted
2019-08-07SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2019-08-07SenateConf Com Reported
2019-07-30HouseConf Com Appointed
2019-07-24SenateConf Com Appointed
2019-07-24SenateFailed Concur In H Com Sub
2019-07-23SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-07-23HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-07-22HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-07-22HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-22HouseAmend Adopted A4
2019-07-22HouseAmend Adopted A3
2019-07-17HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-17HouseAmend Adopted A2
2019-07-17HouseAmend Failed A1
2019-07-16HousePlaced On Cal For 07/17/2019
2019-07-15HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-07-15HouseReptd Fav
2019-07-10HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-10HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-25HouseRe-ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-25HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-07HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-07HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-06HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-05-06SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-05-02SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-02SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-01SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-17SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-17SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-04-17SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-03SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-03SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-02SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-02SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-01SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S438
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S438v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S438v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S438v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S438v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S438v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S438v5.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/153
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/685
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/684
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/683
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/688
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/687
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/686
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/528
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/543
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/745

Bill Comments

feedback