NC S444 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Ch. SL 2019-141
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Allow Use of Oyster Shells As Serving Dishes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allow Use of Oyster Shells As Serving Dishes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-09 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-19 Ch. SL 2019-141
2019-07-19 Signed by Gov. 7/19/2019
2019-07-11 Pres. To Gov. 7/11/2019
2019-07-10 Ratified
2019-07-09HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-09HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-09HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-08HousePlaced On Cal For 07/09/2019
2019-07-08HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-07-08HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-25HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-25HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-17HouseRe-ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-17HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-07HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-07HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-06HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-05-06SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-05-02SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-02SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-01SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-18SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-18SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-03SenateRe-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-03SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-02SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-02SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-01SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback