NC S452 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
2019 Governor's Budget
Title
2019 Governor's Budget
Sponsors
Sen. Harry Brown [R] | Sen. Kathryn Harrington [R] | Sen. William Jackson [R] | Sen. Benjamin Clark [D] |
Sen. James Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H588 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S452 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S452v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S452v1.pdf |