NC S458 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-536
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-536
Summary
GED HS Diploma/No Drug Convict/Bail Bondsman.
Title
GED HS Diploma/No Drug Convict/Bail Bondsman.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-28 | Ch. SL 2009-536 | |
2009-08-28 | Signed By Gov. 8/28/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Pres. To Gov. 8/5/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Ratified | |
2009-08-04 | Concurred On 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-03 | Concurred On 2nd Reading | |
2009-07-30 | Placed On Cal For 8/3/2009 | |
2009-07-28 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-07-28 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-27 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-07-27 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-07-23 | Placed On Cal For 7/27/2009 | |
2009-07-23 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-23 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-07-02 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-07-02 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-04 | Ref to the Com on Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-05-04 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-29 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-28 | Placed On Cal For 4/29/2009 | |
2009-04-28 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-04-28 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-04-28 | Amend Adopted #2 | |
2009-04-28 | Amend Failed #1 | |
2009-04-22 | Placed On Cal For 4/28/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-04-22 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-09 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2009-03-05 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S458 |